NY A03145 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 35-5)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-15 - print number 3145b
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Provides that an individual shall not become ineligible under the EPIC program due to an increase in social security benefits or a public or private pension where such increase does not exceed the consumer price index.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides that an individual shall not become ineligible under the EPIC program due to an increase in social security benefits or a public or private pension where such increase does not exceed the consumer price index.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-09 - Assembly - Assembly Aging Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-15Assemblyprint number 3145b
2019-05-15Assemblyamend and recommit to ways and means
2019-05-02Assemblyprint number 3145a
2019-05-02Assemblyamend and recommit to ways and means
2019-04-09Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2019-01-28Assemblyreferred to aging

Same As/Similar To

S02187 (Same As) 2019-05-21 - referred to ways and means

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback