NY A03142 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-18 - opinion referred to judiciary
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-18 - opinion referred to judiciary
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to prohibiting involuntary employment of prisoners; provides that no prisoner shall be compelled to provide labor against his or her will by actual force, threats of force, threats of punishment, threats of legal coercion or by any scheme, plan or pattern intended to cause the person to believe that, if such person did not provide such labor that such person or another person would suffer serious harm or physical restraint.
Title
Relates to prohibiting involuntary employment of prisoners; provides that no prisoner shall be compelled to provide labor against his or her will by actual force, threats of force, threats of punishment, threats of legal coercion or by any scheme, plan or pattern intended to cause the person to believe that, if such person did not provide such labor that such person or another person would suffer serious harm or physical restraint.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-18 | Assembly | opinion referred to judiciary |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | to attorney-general for opinion |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to correction |
2021-02-18 | Assembly | opinion referred to judiciary |
2021-01-28 | Assembly | to attorney-general for opinion |
2021-01-22 | Assembly | referred to correction |
Same As/Similar To
S00308 (Same As) 2022-03-01 - OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY