NY A03135 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-26 - REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-26 - REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the issuance and display of a TNC driver identification card which includes such driver's name, photograph and license plate number, and additionally requires each TNC vehicle to display an illuminated sign indicating the TNC for which the TNC driver is providing the TNC service or TNC prearranged trip; requires rules to implement a machine-readable code or image.
Title
Requires the issuance and display of a TNC driver identification card which includes such driver's name, photograph and license plate number, and additionally requires each TNC vehicle to display an illuminated sign indicating the TNC for which the TNC driver is providing the TNC service or TNC prearranged trip; requires rules to implement a machine-readable code or image.
Sponsors
Asm. Patricia Fahy [D] | Asm. Harvey Epstein [D] | Asm. Amy Paulin [D] | Asm. Jo Simon [D] |
Asm. Judy Griffin [D] | Asm. Monica Wallace [D] | Asm. Mary Walsh [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-10 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 149 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation Committee: Favorable (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation Committee: Favorable (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-26 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
2022-01-26 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2022-01-26 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.115 |
2022-01-05 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-01-05 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2021-03-10 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
2021-03-10 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2021-03-10 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2021-03-04 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.143 |
2021-03-03 | Assembly | reported |
2021-01-22 | Assembly | referred to transportation |