NY A03135 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 22 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-05-22 - REFERRED TO MENTAL HEALTH AND DEVELOPMENTAL DISABILITIES
Pending: Senate Mental Health and Developmental Disabilities Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to the right to counsel for persons who receive services through the office of mental health or the office for people with developmental disabilities for certain investigations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to the right to counsel for persons who receive services through the office of mental health or the office for people with developmental disabilities for certain investigations.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-22 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-05-15 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-01-31 - Assembly - Assembly Mental Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-22SenateREFERRED TO MENTAL HEALTH AND DEVELOPMENTAL DISABILITIES
2018-05-22Assemblydelivered to senate
2018-05-22Assemblypassed assembly
2018-05-17Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.906
2018-05-15Assemblyreported
2018-01-03Assemblyreferred to ways and means
2017-02-07Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2017-01-31Assemblyreported referred to codes
2017-01-26Assemblyreferred to mental health

Same As/Similar To

S08768 (Same As) 2018-05-15 - REFERRED TO MENTAL HEALTH AND DEVELOPMENTAL DISABILITIES

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A03135&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttp://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A03135&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A03135
Roll Callhttp://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A03135&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttp://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A03135&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttp://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A03135&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC3
Roll Callhttp://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A03135&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1

Bill Comments

feedback