NY A03130 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 31-8)
Status: Passed on February 4 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-04 - approval memo.170
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 31-8)
Status: Passed on February 4 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-04 - approval memo.170
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the office of the advocate for people with disabilities to advocate on behalf of persons with disabilities and assure that persons with disabilities are afforded the opportunity to exercise all of the rights and responsibilities accorded to citizens of the state of New York.
Title
Establishes the office of the advocate for people with disabilities to advocate on behalf of persons with disabilities and assure that persons with disabilities are afforded the opportunity to exercise all of the rights and responsibilities accorded to citizens of the state of New York.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-04 | Assembly | approval memo.170 |
2022-02-04 | Assembly | signed chap.834 |
2021-12-30 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2021-05-24 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-05-24 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-05-24 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1010 |
2021-05-24 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S1836 |
2021-05-24 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
2021-05-24 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2021-05-24 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2021-05-24 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.86 |
2021-05-24 | Assembly | rules report cal.86 |
2021-05-24 | Assembly | reported |
2021-05-19 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2021-04-27 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2021-01-22 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
Same As/Similar To
S01836 (Same As) 2021-05-24 - SUBSTITUTED BY A3130