NY A03122 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-4)
Status: Engrossed on May 28 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-01 - REFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS
Pending: Senate Corporations, Authorities and Commissions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 28 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-01 - REFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS
Pending: Senate Corporations, Authorities and Commissions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the sale of monuments.
Title
Relates to the sale of monuments.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-28 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 129 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-01 | Senate | REFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS |
2016-06-01 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2016-06-01 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2016-05-26 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.753 |
2016-05-24 | Assembly | reported |
2016-05-04 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2016-04-12 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2016-01-11 | Assembly | committed to corporations, authorities and commissions |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.141 |
2016-01-06 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-01-06 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2015-05-28 | Senate | REFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS |
2015-05-28 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2015-05-28 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2015-05-21 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.407 |
2015-05-19 | Assembly | reported |
2015-04-28 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2015-03-24 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2015-01-22 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
Same As/Similar To
S04701 (Same As) 2016-01-06 - REFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS