NY A03112 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 19 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-06-03 - RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to directing the division of human rights to promulgate regulations requiring the disclosure of lawful source of income rights to prospective tenants; directs certain government entities and non-profit entities authorized to administer public housing programs or assistance to ensure potential recipients of public assistance are informed to their rights related to lawful source of income discrimination.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to directing the division of human rights to promulgate regulations requiring the disclosure of lawful source of income rights to prospective tenants; directs certain government entities and non-profit entities authorized to administer public housing programs or assistance to ensure potential recipients of public assistance are informed to their rights related to lawful source of income discrimination.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-03SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2021-06-03SenatePASSED SENATE
2021-06-03Senate3RD READING CAL.1431
2021-06-03SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S427A
2021-05-19SenateREFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS
2021-05-19Assemblydelivered to senate
2021-05-19Assemblypassed assembly
2021-05-12Assemblyamended on third reading (t) 3112b
2021-05-06Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.297
2021-05-04Assemblyreported
2021-04-27Assemblyreported referred to codes
2021-04-16Assemblyprint number 3112a
2021-04-16Assemblyamend (t) and recommit to governmental operations
2021-01-22Assemblyreferred to governmental operations

Same As/Similar To

S00427 (Same As) 2021-06-03 - SUBSTITUTED BY A3112B

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2021/A3112
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A03112&term=2021&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A03112
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A03112&term=2021&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A03112A
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A03112&term=2021&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A03112B
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A03112&term=2021&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A03112&term=2021&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A03112&term=2021&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2021/A3112#SF1

Bill Comments 750

feedback