NY A03101 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-5)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-06 - referred to veterans' affairs
Pending: Assembly Veterans' Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-06 - referred to veterans' affairs
Pending: Assembly Veterans' Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the issuance of a New York State Korean War Service Medal.
Title
Relates to the issuance of a New York State Korean War Service Medal.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-06 | Assembly | referred to veterans' affairs |
2015-08-07 | Assembly | print number 3101b |
2015-08-07 | Assembly | amend and recommit to veterans' affairs |
2015-02-12 | Assembly | print number 3101a |
2015-02-12 | Assembly | amend and recommit to veterans' affairs |
2015-01-22 | Assembly | referred to veterans' affairs |
Same As/Similar To
S01214 (Same As) 2016-06-02 - referred to veterans' affairs