NY A03098 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-06 - SIGNED CHAP.591
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-06 - SIGNED CHAP.591
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Designates Junior lake and Sparkle lake as inland waterways for purposes of waterfront revitalization.
Title
Designates Junior lake and Sparkle lake as inland waterways for purposes of waterfront revitalization.
Sponsors
Asm. Kevin Byrne [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-06-14 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-14 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-06 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.591 |
2019-11-26 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.336 |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | substituted for a3098b |
2019-06-14 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2019-06-14 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-14 | Senate | REPASSED SENATE |
2019-06-11 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING (T) 3444A |
2019-06-11 | Senate | VOTE RECONSIDERED - RESTORED TO THIRD READING |
2019-06-10 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2019-06-10 | Senate | RECALLED FROM ASSEMBLY |
2019-03-19 | Senate | referred to environmental conservation |
2019-03-19 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-03-19 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-03-14 | Assembly | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-03-13 | Assembly | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-03-12 | Assembly | 1ST REPORT CAL.286 |
2019-02-07 | Assembly | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | substituted by s3444a |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.336 |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | rules report cal.336 |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | reported |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2019-06-06 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2019-05-10 | Assembly | print number 3098b |
2019-05-10 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to environmental conservation |
2019-03-20 | Assembly | print number 3098a |
2019-03-20 | Assembly | amend and recommit to environmental conservation |
2019-01-28 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
Same As/Similar To
S03444 (Same As) 2019-12-06 - SIGNED CHAP.591