NY A03080 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 32-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-06-14 - reported referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to acknowledging the fundamental injustice, cruelty, brutality, and inhumanity of slavery in the city of New York and the state of New York; establishes the New York state community commission on reparations remedies to examine the institution of slavery, subsequently de jure and de facto racial and economic discrimination against African-Americans, the impact of these forces on living African-Americans and to make recommendations on appropriate remedies; makes an appropriation therefor; and provides for the repeal of such provisions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to acknowledging the fundamental injustice, cruelty, brutality, and inhumanity of slavery in the city of New York and the state of New York; establishes the New York state community commission on reparations remedies to examine the institution of slavery, subsequently de jure and de facto racial and economic discrimination against African-Americans, the impact of these forces on living African-Americans and to make recommendations on appropriate remedies; makes an appropriation therefor; and provides for the repeal of such provisions.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-14Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2019-03-26Assemblyprint number 3080a
2019-03-26Assemblyamend (t) and recommit to governmental operations
2019-01-28Assemblyreferred to governmental operations

Same As/Similar To

S02904 (Same As) 2019-04-17 - PRINT NUMBER 2904A

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback