NY A03076 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 20 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-20 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 20 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-20 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the definition of a clinical peer reviewer by clarifying that such term shall be applicable for the entire utilization review and external appeal article and means either a physician or a health care professional with certain qualifications.
Title
Relates to the definition of a clinical peer reviewer by clarifying that such term shall be applicable for the entire utilization review and external appeal article and means either a physician or a health care professional with certain qualifications.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 120 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable (Y: 16 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable (Y: 16 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-20 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2020-07-20 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2020-07-20 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.128 |
2019-05-21 | Assembly | amended on third reading 3076a |
2019-05-20 | Assembly | vote reconsidered - restored to third reading |
2019-05-20 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-05-20 | Senate | recalled from senate |
2019-05-20 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
2019-05-20 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2019-05-20 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.338 |
2019-05-14 | Assembly | reported |
2019-01-28 | Assembly | referred to health |
Same As/Similar To
S08844 (Same As) 2020-07-29 - REFERRED TO RULES