NY A03074 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-18 - opinion referred to judiciary
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the constitution to prevent and mitigate adverse childhood experiences.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amends the constitution to prevent and mitigate adverse childhood experiences.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-18Assemblyopinion referred to judiciary
2021-01-28Assemblyto attorney-general for opinion
2021-01-22Assemblyreferred to children and families

Same As/Similar To

S01067 (Same As) 2021-01-08 - TO ATTORNEY-GENERAL FOR OPINION

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback