NY A03074 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-10)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-04-08 - print number 3074a
Pending: Assembly Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizes summer camps to hire licensed social workers, physical therapists, psychologists, athletic trainers, mental health care professionals, occupational therapists and other licensed professionals to provide services.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizes summer camps to hire licensed social workers, physical therapists, psychologists, athletic trainers, mental health care professionals, occupational therapists and other licensed professionals to provide services.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-04-08Assemblyprint number 3074a
2020-04-08Assemblyamend and recommit to higher education
2020-01-08Assemblyreferred to higher education
2019-01-28Assemblyreferred to higher education

Same As/Similar To

S03834 (Same As) 2020-02-24 - referred to higher education

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback