NY A03068 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-01 - substituted by s4621
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-01 - substituted by s4621
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to appointments to the water board of the city of New York.
Title
Relates to appointments to the water board of the city of New York.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-01 | Assembly | substituted by s4621 |
2015-05-29 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.480 |
2015-05-27 | Assembly | reported |
2015-03-24 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2015-01-22 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
Same As/Similar To
S04621 (Same As) 2016-06-08 - referred to ways and means