NY A03066 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-11 - RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to the composition of the Rochester-Genesee regional transportation authority.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to the composition of the Rochester-Genesee regional transportation authority.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 135 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - Assembly - Assembly Corporations, Authorities And Commissions Committee: Favorable (Y: 21 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-11SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-06-11SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-06-11Senate3RD READING CAL.1254
2019-06-11SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S5389
2019-03-12SenateREFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS
2019-03-12Assemblydelivered to senate
2019-03-12Assemblypassed assembly
2019-03-07Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.109
2019-03-06Assemblyreported
2019-01-28Assemblyreferred to corporations, authorities and commissions

Same As/Similar To

S05389 (Same As) 2019-06-11 - SUBSTITUTED BY A3066

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback