NY A03057 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-2)
Status: Passed on December 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-12-28 - approval memo.37
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Provides that batteries in battery operated single station smoke detecting alarm devices shall be non-replaceable, non-removable and capable of powering the devices for a minimum of ten years.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides that batteries in battery operated single station smoke detecting alarm devices shall be non-replaceable, non-removable and capable of powering the devices for a minimum of ten years.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-06-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 147 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-12-28Senateapproval memo.37
2015-12-28Senatesigned chap.583
2015-12-16Assemblydelivered to governor
2015-06-24SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2015-06-24SenatePASSED SENATE
2015-06-24SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S2696A
2015-06-16SenateREFERRED TO RULES
2015-06-16Assemblydelivered to senate
2015-06-16Assemblypassed assembly
2015-06-10Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.220
2015-06-10Assemblyrules report cal.220
2015-06-10Assemblyreported
2015-06-08Assemblyreported referred to rules
2015-05-28Assemblyreported referred to codes
2015-04-21Assemblyprint number 3057a
2015-04-21Assemblyamend and recommit to governmental operations
2015-01-22Assemblyreferred to governmental operations

Same As/Similar To

S02696 (Same As) 2015-06-24 - SUBSTITUTED BY A3057A

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback