NY A03047 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 17 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-19 - REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 17 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-19 - REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to audits by the state comptroller of certain organizations directly or indirectly controlled by municipal corporations and certain other government entities.
Title
Relates to audits by the state comptroller of certain organizations directly or indirectly controlled by municipal corporations and certain other government entities.
Sponsors
Asm. William Magnarelli [D] | Asm. Harry Bronson [D] | Asm. David Buchwald [D] | Asm. Kenneth Zebrowski [D] |
Asm. John McDonald [D] | Asm. Sandra Galef [D] | Asm. Nily Rozic [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - Assembly - Assembly Local Governments Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - Assembly - Assembly Local Governments Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-19 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2018-03-19 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2018-03-19 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.244 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-01-03 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2017-05-17 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2017-05-17 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2017-05-17 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2017-05-11 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.330 |
2017-05-09 | Assembly | reported |
2017-03-01 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2017-02-14 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2017-01-25 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
Same As/Similar To
S04827 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT