NY A03040 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-4)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-31 - substituted by s4870b
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-31 - substituted by s4870b
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the definition of the practice of pharmacy.
Title
Relates to the definition of the practice of pharmacy.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-31 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-11 - Assembly - Assembly Higher Education Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-11 - Assembly - Assembly Higher Education Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-31 | Assembly | substituted by s4870b |
2022-05-31 | Assembly | rules report cal.442 |
2022-05-31 | Assembly | reported |
2022-05-11 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2022-05-05 | Assembly | print number 3040b |
2022-05-05 | Assembly | amend and recommit to higher education |
2022-05-02 | Assembly | print number 3040a |
2022-05-02 | Assembly | amend and recommit to higher education |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to higher education |
2021-01-22 | Assembly | referred to higher education |
Same As/Similar To
S04870 (Same As) 2022-12-28 - APPROVAL MEMO.87