NY A03040 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on September 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-21 - signed chap.57
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires water works corporations to post water supply statements online if a website exists or make such available to the municipalities' website.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires water works corporations to post water supply statements online if a website exists or make such available to the municipalities' website.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-07-23 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-21 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-07-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-07-13 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-09-21Senatesigned chap.57
2020-09-16Assemblydelivered to governor
2020-07-23SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2020-07-23SenatePASSED SENATE
2020-07-23Senate3RD READING CAL.950
2020-07-23SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S8723
2020-07-21SenateREFERRED TO RULES
2020-07-21Assemblydelivered to senate
2020-07-21Assemblypassed assembly
2020-07-21Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.223
2020-07-21Assemblyrules report cal.223
2020-07-21Assemblyreported
2020-07-13Assemblyreported referred to rules
2020-07-10Assemblyprint number 3040a
2020-07-10Assemblyamend and recommit to health
2020-01-08Assemblyreferred to health
2019-01-28Assemblyreferred to health

Same As/Similar To

S01455 (Same As) 2020-03-11 - referred to health
S08723 (Same As) 2020-07-23 - SUBSTITUTED BY A3040A

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2019/A3040
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A03040&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A03040
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A03040&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A03040A
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A03040&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A03040&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A03040&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2019/A3040#SF1

Bill Comments

feedback