NY A03038 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 57-36)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-15 - print number 3038b
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-15 - print number 3038b
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Enacts "Kirby and Quigley's Law"; expands the definition of aggravated cruelty to animals to include harm to a companion animal during the commission of a felony.
Title
Enacts "Kirby and Quigley's Law"; expands the definition of aggravated cruelty to animals to include harm to a companion animal during the commission of a felony.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Agriculture Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-15 | Assembly | print number 3038b |
2018-05-15 | Assembly | amend and recommit to codes |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2017-06-14 | Assembly | amend by restoring to original print 3038 |
2017-06-14 | Assembly | print number 3038a |
2017-06-14 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to codes |
2017-06-05 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2017-01-24 | Assembly | referred to agriculture |
Same As/Similar To
S01680 (Same As) 2018-06-06 - referred to codes