NY A03037 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-10 - advanced to third reading cal.467
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-10 - advanced to third reading cal.467
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes that state agencies or authorities shall implement gender-neutral terminology on state websites.
Title
Establishes that state agencies or authorities shall implement gender-neutral terminology on state websites.
Sponsors
Asm. Linda Rosenthal [D] | Asm. Chantel Jackson [D] | Asm. Rodneyse Bichotte Hermelyn [D] | Asm. Nader Sayegh [D] |
Asm. Jo Simon [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-08 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-10 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.467 |
2022-03-08 | Assembly | reported |
2022-03-02 | Assembly | print number 3037a |
2022-03-02 | Assembly | amend and recommit to governmental operations |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
2021-05-26 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2021-01-22 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
Same As/Similar To
S08028 (Same As) 2022-01-20 - REFERRED TO INTERNET AND TECHNOLOGY