NY A03034 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on November 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-11-03 - signed chap.558
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on November 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-11-03 - signed chap.558
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that where the taxable status date is on or before April fourteenth, income tax year shall mean the twelve month period for which the owner or owners filed a federal personal income tax return for the year before the income tax year immediately preceding the date of application and where the taxable status date is on or after April fifteenth income tax year shall mean the twelve month period for which owner or owners filed a federal personal income tax return for the income tax year immediately preceding the date of application.
Title
Provides that where the taxable status date is on or before April fourteenth, income tax year shall mean the twelve month period for which the owner or owners filed a federal personal income tax return for the year before the income tax year immediately preceding the date of application and where the taxable status date is on or after April fifteenth income tax year shall mean the twelve month period for which owner or owners filed a federal personal income tax return for the income tax year immediately preceding the date of application.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-09 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-10 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Assembly - Assembly Real Property Taxation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-10 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Assembly - Assembly Real Property Taxation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-11-03 | Assembly | signed chap.558 |
2021-10-22 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2021-06-09 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-06-09 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-06-09 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1637 |
2021-06-09 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S4432 |
2021-05-10 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2021-05-10 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2021-05-10 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2021-05-06 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.296 |
2021-05-04 | Assembly | reported |
2021-04-27 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2021-01-22 | Assembly | referred to real property taxation |
Same As/Similar To
S04432 (Same As) 2021-06-09 - SUBSTITUTED BY A3034