NY A03023 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-13)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-01-05 - referred to higher education
Pending: Assembly Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizes the administration of vaccines for hepatitis A, hepatitis B, human papillomavirus, measles, mumps, rubella, varicella and COVID-19 by a licensed pharmacist.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizes the administration of vaccines for hepatitis A, hepatitis B, human papillomavirus, measles, mumps, rubella, varicella and COVID-19 by a licensed pharmacist.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-01-05Assemblyreferred to higher education
2021-05-14Assemblyprint number 3023b
2021-05-14Assemblyamend (t) and recommit to higher education
2021-03-29Assemblyprint number 3023a
2021-03-29Assemblyamend (t) and recommit to higher education
2021-01-22Assemblyreferred to higher education

Same As/Similar To

S04698 (Same As) 2022-01-05 - REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback