NY A03009 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-3)
Status: Passed on December 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-20 - signed chap.691
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-3)
Status: Passed on December 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-20 - signed chap.691
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for the insurance coverage of the synchronization of multiple prescriptions.
Title
Provides for the insurance coverage of the synchronization of multiple prescriptions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-17 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Insurance Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Insurance Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-20 | Senate | signed chap.691 |
2019-12-10 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2019-06-17 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-17 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-17 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.987 |
2019-06-17 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S4078 |
2019-06-13 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.108 |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | rules report cal.108 |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | reported |
2019-06-05 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2019-01-28 | Assembly | referred to insurance |
Same As/Similar To
S00416 (Same As) 2019-02-05 - RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN
S04078 (Same As) 2019-12-20 - signed chap.691
S04078 (Same As) 2019-12-20 - signed chap.691