NY A03009 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-13 - signed chap.59
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to the New York city personal income tax rates; relates to recouping savings retrospectively from unlawfully claimed exemptions removed during re-registration process; authorizes homeowners who registered for the STAR exemption, but failed to file timely exemption applications with their local assessors, to receive the benefit for the 2014 exemption; makes permanent the itemized deduction limitation applicable to incomes of ten million dollars or greater; amends the personal income and MTA mobility tax statutes for technical changes; adds a reporting requirement to the commercial production tax credit; relates to the Excelsior Jobs Program and significant capital investments; creates the employee training incentive program tax credit within the excelsior tax credit program; imposes tax on wireless telecommunications businesses pursuant to sections 184 and 184-a of the tax law; incorporates the DOS biennial statement requirement into the corporate tax return; makes corrections to the corporate tax reform provisions; and repeals certain provisions of the tax law relating thereto; exempts certain items or tangible personal property furnished to customers by certain cider producers, breweries, and distilleries at tastings; relates to the imposition of the sales and compensating use tax on prepaid mobile calling services; expands the solar panel state and local sales and use tax exemptions; allows a reimbursement of the petroleum business tax for highway diesel motor fuel used in farm production; calculates the estate tax imposed under the tax rate table, clarifies the phase out date for certain gift add backs and disallows deductions relating to intangible personal property for estates of non-resident decedents; relates to warrantless income execution provisions; relates to capital awards to vendor tracks; relates to licenses for simulcast facilities, sums relating to track simulcast, simulcast of out-of-state thoroughbred races, simulcasting of races run by out-of-state harness tracks and distributions of wagers; extends certain provisions relating to simulcasting and the imposition of certain taxes; relates to video lottery gaming; relates to a franchised corporation; relates to a use tax on boats; relates to an aircraft sales tax exemption; relates to a jockey's workers compensation fund; relates to VTL vendor fee rates; and relates to the MTA payroll tax.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to the New York city personal income tax rates; relates to recouping savings retrospectively from unlawfully claimed exemptions removed during re-registration process; authorizes homeowners who registered for the STAR exemption, but failed to file timely exemption applications with their local assessors, to receive the benefit for the 2014 exemption; makes permanent the itemized deduction limitation applicable to incomes of ten million dollars or greater; amends the personal income and MTA mobility tax statutes for technical changes; adds a reporting requirement to the commercial production tax credit; relates to the Excelsior Jobs Program and significant capital investments; creates the employee training incentive program tax credit within the excelsior tax credit program; imposes tax on wireless telecommunications businesses pursuant to sections 184 and 184-a of the tax law; incorporates the DOS biennial statement requirement into the corporate tax return; makes corrections to the corporate tax reform provisions; and repeals certain provisions of the tax law relating thereto; exempts certain items or tangible personal property furnished to customers by certain cider producers, breweries, and distilleries at tastings; relates to the imposition of the sales and compensating use tax on prepaid mobile calling services; expands the solar panel state and local sales and use tax exemptions; allows a reimbursement of the petroleum business tax for highway diesel motor fuel used in farm production; calculates the estate tax imposed under the tax rate table, clarifies the phase out date for certain gift add backs and disallows deductions relating to intangible personal property for estates of non-resident decedents; relates to warrantless income execution provisions; relates to capital awards to vendor tracks; relates to licenses for simulcast facilities, sums relating to track simulcast, simulcast of out-of-state thoroughbred races, simulcasting of races run by out-of-state harness tracks and distributions of wagers; extends certain provisions relating to simulcasting and the imposition of certain taxes; relates to video lottery gaming; relates to a franchised corporation; relates to a use tax on boats; relates to an aircraft sales tax exemption; relates to a jockey's workers compensation fund; relates to VTL vendor fee rates; and relates to the MTA payroll tax.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-03-30 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 112 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-04-13Senatesigned chap.59
2015-04-01Assemblydelivered to governor
2015-03-30SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2015-03-30SenatePASSED SENATE
2015-03-30SenateMESSAGE OF NECESSITY - 3 DAY MESSAGE
2015-03-30SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S2009B
2015-03-30SenateREFERRED TO FINANCE
2015-03-30Assemblydelivered to senate
2015-03-30Assemblypassed assembly
2015-03-30Assemblymessage of necessity - 3 day message
2015-03-30Assemblymotion to amend lost
2015-03-30Assemblymotion to amend lost
2015-03-30Assemblymotion to amend lost
2015-03-30Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.17
2015-03-30Assemblyrules report cal.17
2015-03-30Assemblyreported
2015-03-30Assemblyreported referred to rules
2015-03-28Assemblyprint number 3009b
2015-03-28Assemblyamend (t) and recommit to ways and means
2015-03-28Assemblyprint number 3009a
2015-03-28Assemblyamend (t) and recommit to ways and means
2015-01-21Assemblyreferred to ways and means

Same As/Similar To

S02009 (Same As) 2015-03-30 - SUBSTITUTED BY A3009B

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback