NY A03003 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 12 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-12 - thru line veto memo.33
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Makes appropriations for the support of government - Aid to Localities Budget.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Makes appropriations for the support of government - Aid to Localities Budget.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-05-02 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 114 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-02 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 43 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-02 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 23 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-02 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 20 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-05-12Assemblythru line veto memo.33
2023-05-12Assemblytabled line veto memo.1
2023-05-12Assemblythru line veto memo.33
2023-05-12Assemblyline veto memo.1
2023-05-12Assemblysigned chap.53
2023-05-02Assemblydelivered to governor
2023-05-02SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2023-05-02SenatePASSED SENATE
2023-05-02Senate3RD READING CAL.721
2023-05-02SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S4003D
2023-05-02SenateREFERRED TO FINANCE
2023-05-02Assemblydelivered to senate
2023-05-02Assemblypassed assembly
2023-05-02Assemblymessage of necessity - 3 day message
2023-05-02Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.130
2023-05-02Assemblyrules report cal.130
2023-05-02Assemblyreported
2023-05-02Assemblyreported referred to rules
2023-05-01Assemblyprint number 3003d
2023-05-01Assemblyamend and recommit to ways and means
2023-05-01Assemblyprint number 3003c
2023-05-01Assemblyamend and recommit to ways and means
2023-03-14Assemblyprint number 3003b
2023-03-14Assemblyamend and recommit to ways and means
2023-03-06Assemblyprint number 3003a
2023-03-06Assemblyamend and recommit to ways and means
2023-02-01Assemblyreferred to ways and means

Same As/Similar To

S04003 (Same As) 2023-05-02 - SUBSTITUTED BY A3003D

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2023/A3003
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A03003&term=2023&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A03003A
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A03003&term=2023&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A03003B
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A03003&term=2023&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A03003D
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A03003&term=2023&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A03003&term=2023&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2023/A3003#SF1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A03003&term=2023&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1

Bill Comments

feedback