NY A02987 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on December 13 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-12-13 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Permits consent for service in the form of magnetic tape or through electronic means for certain collection procedures by the sheriff's office or an officer or employee of the department of taxation and finance.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Permits consent for service in the form of magnetic tape or through electronic means for certain collection procedures by the sheriff's office or an officer or employee of the department of taxation and finance.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-06-05 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-12-13Assemblytabled
2024-12-13Assemblyvetoed memo.75
2024-12-02Assemblydelivered to governor
2024-06-05SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2024-06-05SenatePASSED SENATE
2024-06-05Senate3RD READING CAL.1756
2024-06-05SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S5240
2024-06-03SenateREFERRED TO RULES
2024-06-03Assemblydelivered to senate
2024-06-03Assemblypassed assembly
2024-06-03Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.304
2024-06-03Assemblyrules report cal.304
2024-06-03Assemblyreported
2024-06-03Assemblyreported referred to rules
2024-01-03Assemblyreferred to ways and means
2023-02-01Assemblyreferred to ways and means

Same As/Similar To

S05240 (Same As) 2024-06-05 - SUBSTITUTED BY A2987

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback