NY A02976 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-07-15 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to voluntary contributions in support of municipal animal pounds or shelters.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to voluntary contributions in support of municipal animal pounds or shelters.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-07-15Assemblyenacting clause stricken
2024-05-30Assemblyprint number 2976a
2024-05-30Assemblyamend and recommit to agriculture
2024-01-03Assemblyreferred to agriculture
2023-02-01Assemblyreferred to agriculture

Same As/Similar To

S07777 (Same As) 2024-06-04 - referred to agriculture

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback