NY A02967 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-01-26 - advanced to third reading cal.308
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizes the housing part of the civil court of the city of New York on its own motion or on the motion of a party to join the department of social services of the city of New York as a party in any action or proceeding wherein the failure of a recipient of or applicant for public assistance to pay rent is at issue; also permits the court to join the division of adult protective services of the city of New York, where appropriate.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizes the housing part of the civil court of the city of New York on its own motion or on the motion of a party to join the department of social services of the city of New York as a party in any action or proceeding wherein the failure of a recipient of or applicant for public assistance to pay rent is at issue; also permits the court to join the division of adult protective services of the city of New York, where appropriate.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2012-01-26Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.308
2012-01-24Assemblyreported
2012-01-04Assemblyreferred to judiciary
2011-05-12Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.314
2011-05-10Assemblyreported
2011-01-21Assemblyreferred to judiciary

Same As/Similar To

S00055 (Same As) 2012-01-04 - REFERRED TO JUDICIARY

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback