NY A02963 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 19 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-19 - substituted by s9089
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 19 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-19 - substituted by s9089
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to correcting the spelling of the Verrazzano-Narrows bridge.
Title
Relates to correcting the spelling of the Verrazzano-Narrows bridge.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 142 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-19 | Assembly | substituted by s9089 |
2018-06-19 | Assembly | vote reconsidered - restored to third reading |
2018-06-19 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-06-18 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.295 |
2018-06-18 | Assembly | rules report cal.295 |
2018-06-18 | Assembly | reported |
2018-06-18 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2018-06-15 | Assembly | print number 2963b |
2018-06-15 | Assembly | amend and recommit to ways and means |
2018-06-14 | Assembly | reference changed to ways and means |
2018-05-07 | Assembly | print number 2963a |
2018-05-07 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to corporations, authorities and commissions |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
2017-01-23 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
Same As/Similar To
S00419 (Same As) 2018-06-06 - referred to corporations, authorities and commissions
S09089 (Same As) 2018-10-01 - SIGNED CHAP.288
S09089 (Same As) 2018-10-01 - SIGNED CHAP.288