NY A02954 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 94-15)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-06-11 - reported referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Enacts the "safe staffing for quality care act" to require acute care facilities and nursing homes to implement certain direct-care nurse to patient ratios in all nursing units; sets minimum staffing requirements; requires every such facility to submit a documented staffing plan to the department on an annual basis and upon application for an operating certificate; requires acute care facilities to maintain staffing records during all shifts; authorizes nurses to refuse work assignments if the assignment exceeds the nurse's abilities or if minimum staffing is not present; requires public access to documented staffing plans; imposes civil penalties for violations of such provisions; establishes private right of action for nurses discriminated against for refusing any illegal work assignment.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Enacts the "safe staffing for quality care act" to require acute care facilities and nursing homes to implement certain direct-care nurse to patient ratios in all nursing units; sets minimum staffing requirements; requires every such facility to submit a documented staffing plan to the department on an annual basis and upon application for an operating certificate; requires acute care facilities to maintain staffing records during all shifts; authorizes nurses to refuse work assignments if the assignment exceeds the nurse's abilities or if minimum staffing is not present; requires public access to documented staffing plans; imposes civil penalties for violations of such provisions; establishes private right of action for nurses discriminated against for refusing any illegal work assignment.

Sponsors

Asm. Aileen Gunther [D]Asm. Richard Gottfried [D]Asm. Linda Rosenthal [D]Asm. Harry Bronson [D]
Asm. William Colton [D]Asm. Michael Benedetto [D]Asm. Ellen Jaffee [D]Asm. William Magnarelli [D]
Asm. Michael Miller [D]Asm. Mark Weprin [D]Asm. Jose Rivera [D]Asm. Sean Ryan [D]
Asm. Jeffrion Aubry [D]Asm. Steven Otis [D]Asm. Phillip Steck [D]Asm. Angelo Santabarbara [D]
Asm. Kenneth Zebrowski [D]Asm. Walter Mosley [D]Asm. Felix Ortiz [D]Asm. Michele Titus [D]
Asm. Thomas Abinanti [D]Asm. Charles Barron [D]Asm. Rebecca Seawright [D]Asm. Latrice Walker [D]
Asm. Rodneyse Bichotte [D]Asm. Diane Richardson [D]Asm. Alicia Hyndman [D]Asm. Crystal Peoples-Stokes [D]
Asm. Victor Pichardo [D]Asm. Latoya Joyner [D]Asm. Kimberly Jean-Pierre [D]Asm. Joseph Lentol [D]
Asm. Nily Rozic [D]Asm. Ron Kim [D]Asm. Andrew Hevesi [D]Asm. Daniel O'Donnell [D]
Asm. Erik Dilan [D]Asm. Maritza Davila [D]Asm. Pamela Hunter [D]Asm. Michael Blake [D]
Asm. Jaime Williams [D]Asm. Robert Carroll [D]Asm. Anthony D'Urso [D]Asm. Carrie Woerner [D]
Asm. Stacey Pheffer Amato [D]Asm. D. Billy Jones [D]Asm. Tremaine Wright [D]Asm. Clyde Vanel [D]
Asm. Yuh-line Niou [D]Asm. Alfred Taylor [D]Asm. Carmen Arroyo [D]Asm. Jeffrey Dinowitz [D]
Asm. Inez Dickens [D]Asm. Monica Wallace [D]Asm. Doug Smith [R]Asm. Michael Montesano [R]
Asm. Kevin Byrne [R]Asm. Karl Brabenec [R]Asm. Patrick Burke [D]Asm. Karines Reyes [D]
Asm. Steve Stern [D]Asm. Michael LiPetri [R]Asm. Charles Lavine [D]Asm. John Salka [R]
Asm. Nader Sayegh [D]Asm. Jonathan Jacobson [D]Asm. Karen McMahon [D]Asm. Peter Abbate [D]
Asm. Joseph DeStefano [R]Asm. Colin Schmitt [R]Asm. Catherine Nolan [D]Asm. Charles Fall [D]
Asm. Angelo Morinello [R]Asm. Kevin Cahill [D]Asm. Nathalia Fernandez [D]Asm. Mathylde Frontus [D]
Asm. Harvey Epstein [D]Asm. Brian Miller [R]Asm. Marianne Buttenschon [D]Asm. Philip Ramos [D]
Asm. Taylor Darling [D]Asm. Edward Braunstein [D]Asm. Carmen De La Rosa [D]Asm. Brian Barnwell [D]
Asm. David Buchwald [D]Asm. Vivian Cook [D]Asm. Marcos Crespo [D]Asm. Michael Cusick [D]
Asm. Steven Cymbrowitz [D]Asm. Michael DenDekker [D]Asm. Steven Englebright [D]Asm. Patricia Fahy [D]
Asm. Sandra Galef [D]Asm. Deborah Glick [D]Asm. Mark Johns [R]Asm. Barbara Lifton [D]
Asm. Donna Lupardo [D]Asm. David McDonough [R]Asm. John Mikulin [R]Asm. Amy Paulin [D]
Asm. Nick Perry [D]Asm. Gary Pretlow [D]Asm. Edward Ra [R]Asm. Daniel Rosenthal [D]
Asm. Jo Simon [D]Asm. Aravella Simotas [D]Asm. Michaelle Solages [D]Asm. Fred Thiele [D]
Asm. Mary Walsh [R]

Roll Calls

2019-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 18 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 22 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-11Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2019-04-30Assemblyreported referred to codes
2019-01-28Assemblyreferred to health

Same As/Similar To

S01032 (Same As) 2019-01-10 - REFERRED TO HEALTH

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback