NY A02947 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-2)
Status: Engrossed on April 8 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-08 - REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to requiring notice and confirmation of such notice by affected local taxing jurisdictions and school districts prior to approval of projects by industrial development agencies.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to requiring notice and confirmation of such notice by affected local taxing jurisdictions and school districts prior to approval of projects by industrial development agencies.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-08 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - Assembly - Assembly Local Governments Committee: Favorable (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-08SenateREFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT
2019-04-08Assemblydelivered to senate
2019-04-08Assemblypassed assembly
2019-04-04Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.169
2019-04-02Assemblyreported
2019-01-28Assemblyreferred to local governments

Same As/Similar To

S02769 (Same As) 2019-01-29 - REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback