NY A02927 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-1)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to medicaid eligibility for youth leaving court ordered placement.
Title
Relates to medicaid eligibility for youth leaving court ordered placement.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-11 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2019-04-10 | Assembly | print number 2927a |
2019-04-10 | Assembly | amend and recommit to ways and means |
2019-02-11 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2019-01-28 | Assembly | referred to health |
Same As/Similar To
S04205 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO HEALTH