NY A02927 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-1)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-10 - print number 2927a
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to medicaid eligibility for youth leaving court ordered placement.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to medicaid eligibility for youth leaving court ordered placement.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-11 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-10Assemblyprint number 2927a
2019-04-10Assemblyamend and recommit to ways and means
2019-02-11Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2019-01-28Assemblyreferred to health

Same As/Similar To

S04205 (Same As) 2019-05-14 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback