NY A02919 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 89-8)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-08-17 - print number 2919c
Pending: Assembly Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-08-17 - print number 2919c
Pending: Assembly Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to certified public accountants.
Title
Relates to certified public accountants.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-17 | Assembly | print number 2919c |
2020-08-17 | Assembly | amend and recommit to higher education |
2020-07-24 | Assembly | print number 2919b |
2020-07-24 | Assembly | amend and recommit to higher education |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to higher education |
2019-04-30 | Assembly | print number 2919a |
2019-04-30 | Assembly | amend and recommit to higher education |
2019-01-28 | Assembly | referred to higher education |
Same As/Similar To
S03842 (Same As) 2020-08-03 - PRINT NUMBER 3842D