NY A02914 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-19 - REFERRED TO HEALTH
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-19 - REFERRED TO HEALTH
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to requiring that information be made available to parents regarding window blind safety.
Title
Relates to requiring that information be made available to parents regarding window blind safety.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-02 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 130 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-19 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
2018-03-19 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2018-03-19 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.237 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-01-03 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2017-03-02 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
2017-03-02 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2017-03-02 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2017-02-23 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.74 |
2017-02-14 | Assembly | reported |
2017-01-23 | Assembly | referred to health |
Same As/Similar To
S01868 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - REFERRED TO HEALTH