NY A02902 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 13 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-10-13 - signed chap.522
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to the utilization of a pressurized mixing and dispensing system; permits a retail licensee for on-premises consumption to prepare and keep drinks containing alcoholic beverages in dispensing machines, having a capacity of not less than a gallon, utilizing a pressurized mixing and dispensing system.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to the utilization of a pressurized mixing and dispensing system; permits a retail licensee for on-premises consumption to prepare and keep drinks containing alcoholic beverages in dispensing machines, having a capacity of not less than a gallon, utilizing a pressurized mixing and dispensing system.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-03-01 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-02-27 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2023-02-14 - Assembly - Assembly Economic Development Committee: Favorable (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-10-13Assemblysigned chap.522
2023-10-07Assemblydelivered to governor
2023-03-01SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2023-03-01SenatePASSED SENATE
2023-03-01Senate3RD READING CAL.281
2023-03-01SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S3364A
2023-02-27SenateREFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS
2023-02-27Assemblydelivered to senate
2023-02-27Assemblypassed assembly
2023-02-16Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.14
2023-02-14Assemblyreported
2023-02-01Assemblyreferred to economic development

Same As/Similar To

S03364 (Same As) 2023-03-01 - SUBSTITUTED BY A2902

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback