NY A02902 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-2)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-09 - amended on third reading 2902a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-09 - amended on third reading 2902a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that the superintendent of financial services shall establish standards for hurricane windstorm deductibles, creating uniformity in the operation of such deductibles with respect to the triggering event.
Title
Provides that the superintendent of financial services shall establish standards for hurricane windstorm deductibles, creating uniformity in the operation of such deductibles with respect to the triggering event.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-09 - Assembly - Assembly Insurance Committee: Favorable (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-09 | Assembly | amended on third reading 2902a |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.123 |
2019-04-25 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.187 |
2019-04-09 | Assembly | reported |
2019-01-28 | Assembly | referred to insurance |
Same As/Similar To
S03324 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO INSURANCE