NY A02901 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 69-27)
Status: Engrossed on June 18 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-07 - REFERRED TO CHILDREN AND FAMILIES
Pending: Senate Children and Families Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 18 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-07 - REFERRED TO CHILDREN AND FAMILIES
Pending: Senate Children and Families Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to adoptee rights; clarifies language and procedures for obtaining birth certificates and medical histories of adoptees; permits an adopted adult to access certain records when they reach the age of 18; creates a contact preference to be filed by birth parents.
Title
Relates to adoptee rights; clarifies language and procedures for obtaining birth certificates and medical histories of adoptees; permits an adopted adult to access certain records when they reach the age of 18; creates a contact preference to be filed by birth parents.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 125 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-07 | Senate | REFERRED TO CHILDREN AND FAMILIES |
2016-06-07 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2016-06-07 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2016-05-25 | Assembly | amended on third reading 2901c |
2016-02-24 | Assembly | amended on third reading 2901b |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.131 |
2016-01-06 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-01-06 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2015-06-18 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2015-06-18 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2015-06-18 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2015-06-17 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.518 |
2015-06-17 | Assembly | rules report cal.518 |
2015-06-17 | Assembly | reported |
2015-06-16 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2015-06-14 | Assembly | print number 2901a |
2015-06-14 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to codes |
2015-02-10 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2015-01-20 | Assembly | referred to health |