NY A02873 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-06-07 - substituted by s5621b
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-06-07 - substituted by s5621b
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to reporting of digital assets on the annual statement of financial disclosure filed with the legislative ethics commission or the joint commission on public ethics.
Title
Relates to reporting of digital assets on the annual statement of financial disclosure filed with the legislative ethics commission or the joint commission on public ethics.
Sponsors
Asm. Anna Kelles [D] | Asm. Jo Simon [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-03-15 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 117 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-03-15 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 20 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-03-15 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-15 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 20 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-03-15 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-07 | Assembly | substituted by s5621b |
2023-05-22 | Assembly | amended on third reading (t) 2873b |
2023-05-22 | Assembly | vote reconsidered - restored to third reading |
2023-05-22 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2023-05-22 | Senate | RECOMMITTED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2023-05-22 | Senate | SUBSTITUTION RECONSIDERED |
2023-05-22 | Assembly | recalled from senate |
2023-05-18 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.764 |
2023-05-18 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S5621A |
2023-03-15 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2023-03-15 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2023-03-15 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2023-03-15 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.107 |
2023-03-15 | Assembly | rules report cal.107 |
2023-03-15 | Assembly | reported |
2023-03-15 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2023-03-10 | Assembly | print number 2873a |
2023-03-10 | Assembly | amend and recommit to governmental operations |
2023-01-27 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
Same As/Similar To
S05621 (Same As) 2023-05-18 - SUBSTITUTED BY A2873A