NY A02865 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-05 - print number 2865a
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-05 - print number 2865a
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that the court shall not reduce jury awards as excessive in employment discrimination actions unless the court finds exceptional circumstances which compel the conclusion that the jury was influenced by partiality, prejudice, mistake or corruption.
Title
Provides that the court shall not reduce jury awards as excessive in employment discrimination actions unless the court finds exceptional circumstances which compel the conclusion that the jury was influenced by partiality, prejudice, mistake or corruption.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-05 | Assembly | print number 2865a |
2024-01-05 | Assembly | amend and recommit to judiciary |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
2023-01-27 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S00017 (Same As) 2024-02-05 - ADVANCED TO THIRD READING