NY A02865 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-06 - advanced to third reading cal.390
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-06 - advanced to third reading cal.390
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that testing positive for marihuana on a drug test shall not be determinative of whether a certified patient is performing his or her employment duties while impaired by a controlled substance or be the basis for a hiring decision or disciplinary action against such patient.
Title
Provides that testing positive for marihuana on a drug test shall not be determinative of whether a certified patient is performing his or her employment duties while impaired by a controlled substance or be the basis for a hiring decision or disciplinary action against such patient.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-04 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable (Y: 17 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-06 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.390 |
2020-02-04 | Assembly | reported |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to health |
2019-01-28 | Assembly | referred to health |