NY A02858 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 57-27)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-21 - reported referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Increases the amount of money a retiree may earn in a position of public service in the year 2020 and thereafter to $35,000.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Increases the amount of money a retiree may earn in a position of public service in the year 2020 and thereafter to $35,000.

Sponsors

Asm. John McDonald [D]Asm. Rodneyse Bichotte [D]Asm. Karl Brabenec [R]Asm. Vivian Cook [D]
Asm. Clifford Crouch [R]Asm. Richard Gottfried [D]Asm. Aileen Gunther [D]Asm. Ellen Jaffee [D]
Asm. Jose Rivera [D]Asm. Albert Stirpe [D]Asm. Victor Pichardo [D]Asm. Steven Englebright [D]
Asm. David DiPietro [R]Asm. Donna Lupardo [D]Asm. Angelo Santabarbara [D]Asm. Carrie Woerner [D]
Asm. Fred Thiele [D]Asm. Michael Cusick [D]Asm. Kevin Byrne [R]Asm. Angelo Morinello [R]
Asm. Michael Blake [D]Asm. Clyde Vanel [D]Asm. Patricia Fahy [D]Asm. Christopher Friend [R]
Asm. Nily Rozic [D]Asm. Michael Benedetto [D]Asm. Diane Richardson [D]Asm. Michael Montesano [R]
Asm. Latoya Joyner [D]Asm. Michael Norris [R]Asm. Deborah Glick [D]Asm. Jaime Williams [D]
Asm. Thomas Abinanti [D]Asm. Edward Braunstein [D]Asm. Sandra Galef [D]Asm. D. Billy Jones [D]
Asm. Anthony D'Urso [D]Asm. Joseph Lentol [D]Asm. Steven Cymbrowitz [D]Asm. Felix Ortiz [D]
Asm. Charles Barron [D]Asm. Michaelle Solages [D]Asm. Peter Lawrence [R]Asm. David McDonough [R]
Asm. Walter Mosley [D]Asm. Monica Wallace [D]Asm. Barbara Lifton [D]Asm. Daniel O'Donnell [D]
Asm. Daniel Rosenthal [D]Asm. Carmen Arroyo [D]Asm. Anthony Palumbo [R]Asm. Joseph Giglio [R]
Asm. Kenneth Blankenbush [R]Asm. Andrew Garbarino [R]Asm. Brian Miller [R]Asm. Kevin Cahill [D]
Asm. Maritza Davila [D]Asm. William Colton [D]Asm. Andrew Goodell [R]Asm. Steve Stern [D]
Asm. Andrew Raia [R]Asm. Tremaine Wright [D]Asm. Alfred Taylor [D]Asm. Nader Sayegh [D]
Asm. Marjorie Byrnes [R]Asm. Robert Smullen [R]Asm. Edward Ra [R]Asm. Judy Griffin [D]
Asm. Marianne Buttenschon [D]Asm. Taylor Raynor [D]Asm. Phillip Steck [D]Asm. William Barclay [R]
Asm. David Buchwald [D]Asm. Marcos Crespo [D]Asm. Michael DenDekker [D]Asm. Harvey Epstein [D]
Asm. Michael Fitzpatrick [R]Asm. Stephen Hawley [R]Asm. Kimberly Jean-Pierre [D]Asm. Brian Manktelow [R]
Asm. Philip Palmesano [R]Asm. Jo Simon [D]Asm. Daniel Stec [R]Asm. Christopher Tague [R]

Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-21Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2019-05-17Assemblyprint number 2858b
2019-05-17Assemblyamend and recommit to governmental employees
2019-02-20Assemblyprint number 2858a
2019-02-20Assemblyamend and recommit to governmental employees
2019-01-28Assemblyreferred to governmental employees

Same As/Similar To

S01866 (Same As) 2019-05-20 - PRINT NUMBER 1866B

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback