NY A02858 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 60-31)
Status: Passed on December 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-06 - SIGNED CHAP.589
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 60-31)
Status: Passed on December 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-06 - SIGNED CHAP.589
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Increases the amount of money a retiree may earn in a position of public service in the year 2020 and thereafter to $35,000.
Title
Increases the amount of money a retiree may earn in a position of public service in the year 2020 and thereafter to $35,000.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-12 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Employees Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Employees Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-06 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.589 |
2019-11-26 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-13 | Senate | returned to senate |
2019-06-13 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-06-13 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.106 |
2019-06-13 | Senate | substituted for a2858b |
2019-06-12 | Senate | referred to ways and means |
2019-06-12 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-12 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-12 | Assembly | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1286 |
2019-06-12 | Assembly | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-05-20 | Assembly | PRINT NUMBER 1866B |
2019-05-20 | Assembly | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2019-02-28 | Assembly | PRINT NUMBER 1866A |
2019-02-28 | Assembly | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2019-01-17 | Assembly | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | substituted by s1866b |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.106 |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | rules report cal.106 |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | reported |
2019-06-05 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2019-05-21 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2019-05-17 | Assembly | print number 2858b |
2019-05-17 | Assembly | amend and recommit to governmental employees |
2019-02-20 | Assembly | print number 2858a |
2019-02-20 | Assembly | amend and recommit to governmental employees |
2019-01-28 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
Same As/Similar To
S01866 (Same As) 2019-12-06 - SIGNED CHAP.589