NY A02832 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-2)
Status: Engrossed on May 14 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-14 - REFERRED TO INSURANCE
Pending: Senate Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requires health insurers to provide an insurer or subscriber who is a victim of domestic violence, upon request of such insurer or subscriber, with the option to designate alternative contact information for the purpose of receiving specific claim information or for specific billing purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires health insurers to provide an insurer or subscriber who is a victim of domestic violence, upon request of such insurer or subscriber, with the option to designate alternative contact information for the purpose of receiving specific claim information or for specific billing purposes.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-14 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - Assembly - Assembly Insurance Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-14SenateREFERRED TO INSURANCE
2019-05-14Assemblydelivered to senate
2019-05-14Assemblypassed assembly
2019-05-09Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.285
2019-05-07Assemblyreported
2019-05-06Assemblyreported referred to codes
2019-01-25Assemblyreferred to insurance

Same As/Similar To

S00067 (Same As) 2019-01-09 - REFERRED TO INSURANCE

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback