NY A02831 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-03 - ordered to third reading cal.227
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-03 - ordered to third reading cal.227
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for the protection of the air quality at licensed day care centers and head start day care centers funded pursuant to federal law; requires the office of children and family services to consult with the commissioners of environmental conservation and health regarding the air quality and environmental hazards that may be involved with any new day care center or head start day care center; requires such office to consult with the department of health if any new environmental or environmental health hazard arises.
Title
Provides for the protection of the air quality at licensed day care centers and head start day care centers funded pursuant to federal law; requires the office of children and family services to consult with the commissioners of environmental conservation and health regarding the air quality and environmental hazards that may be involved with any new day care center or head start day care center; requires such office to consult with the department of health if any new environmental or environmental health hazard arises.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-07 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 23 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 23 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-03 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.227 |
2017-03-09 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.120 |
2017-03-07 | Assembly | reported |
2017-02-14 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2017-01-23 | Assembly | referred to health |
Same As/Similar To
S01103 (Same As) 2018-01-09 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE