NY A02824 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-03 - advanced to third reading cal.830
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-03 - advanced to third reading cal.830
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that the state liquor authority may, with the consent of the applicant, include certain terms and conditions as part of various licenses for on-premises consumption of beer and liquor for the purpose of assuring that the licensed premises are operated in accordance with law and consistent with the public interest; provides that prior to including terms and conditions in a license, the authority shall consult with the applicant and any party entitled to receive notice of the application; and provides that the terms and conditions shall be legally enforceable in the same manner as applicable provisions of this chapter or regulations of the authority.
Title
Provides that the state liquor authority may, with the consent of the applicant, include certain terms and conditions as part of various licenses for on-premises consumption of beer and liquor for the purpose of assuring that the licensed premises are operated in accordance with law and consistent with the public interest; provides that prior to including terms and conditions in a license, the authority shall consult with the applicant and any party entitled to receive notice of the application; and provides that the terms and conditions shall be legally enforceable in the same manner as applicable provisions of this chapter or regulations of the authority.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-01 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - Assembly - Assembly Economic Development Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 14 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - Assembly - Assembly Economic Development Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 14 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-03 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.830 |
2018-05-01 | Assembly | reported |
2018-04-17 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to economic development |
2017-01-23 | Assembly | referred to economic development |
Same As/Similar To
S00080 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS