NY A02806 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 22-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-07-13 - held for consideration in health
Pending: Assembly Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizes the state to allow counties to opt out of the county cost of medical assistance payments to any new enrollees who have either never received such benefits or who have reenrolled after a period of absence; further directs the commissioner of health to apply for any and all federal waivers required to implement the provisions of this subdivision.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizes the state to allow counties to opt out of the county cost of medical assistance payments to any new enrollees who have either never received such benefits or who have reenrolled after a period of absence; further directs the commissioner of health to apply for any and all federal waivers required to implement the provisions of this subdivision.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-07-13 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Held for Consideration (Y: 18 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-07-13Assemblyheld for consideration in health
2020-01-08Assemblyreferred to health
2019-01-25Assemblyreferred to health

Same As/Similar To

S08798 (Same As) 2020-07-16 - REFERRED TO RULES

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback