NY A02800 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-08 - opinion referred to judiciary
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Provides that the voting age in New York be 16 years old.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides that the voting age in New York be 16 years old.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-08Assemblyopinion referred to judiciary
2019-04-12Assemblyto attorney-general for opinion
2019-04-02Assemblyprint number 2800a
2019-04-02Assemblyamend and recommit to election law
2019-02-13Assemblyopinion referred to judiciary
2019-01-30Assemblyto attorney-general for opinion
2019-01-25Assemblyreferred to election law

Same As/Similar To

S02272 (Same As) 2019-04-10 - PRINT NUMBER 2272A

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback