NY A02780 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-14 - opinion referred to judiciary
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-14 - opinion referred to judiciary
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the legislature to require a state or municipal entity to enact a period of residency requirement for persons applying for certain social services.
Title
Authorizes the legislature to require a state or municipal entity to enact a period of residency requirement for persons applying for certain social services.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-14 | Assembly | opinion referred to judiciary |
2020-01-17 | Assembly | to attorney-general for opinion |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to social services |
2019-02-13 | Assembly | opinion referred to judiciary |
2019-01-30 | Assembly | to attorney-general for opinion |
2019-01-25 | Assembly | referred to social services |